SEXPRESSION:UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sexpression:UK is a nationwide student-led project that empowers young people to make informed decisions about relationships and sex by running informal, inclusive and comprehensive relationship and sex education sessions in the local communities of our branches. We currently operate in over 25 towns and cities in all four countries of the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
311 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 April 2016: CIO registration
- SEXPRESSSION:UK (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Liepa | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Westlake | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bally Kaur | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Marsh | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Archibald | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anya Metzer | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Malone | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Lloyd | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harun Tulunay | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Molly Houghton | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ella Watson | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | £3.66k | £5.54k | £25.14k | £6.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.18k | £3.95k | £2.54k | £9.61k | £12.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 15 APR 2016 AMENDED ON 24 SEP 2016 AMENDED ON 26 APR 2017 as amended on 01 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE UK WITH SPECIFIC FOCUS ON IMPROVING THE SEXUAL HEALTH AND RELATIONSHIP EDUCATION (SRE) OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11-18.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sexpression:UK
International House
64 Nile Street
London
N1 7SR
- Phone:
- 07375475240
- Email:
- director@sexpression.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window