PET EMERGENCY TREATMENT CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve financial hardship of those who are unable to meet the costs of veterinary care by providing financial support to relieve the suffering of animals in need of such veterinary care, treatment and attention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/07/2016 | 10/07/2017 | 10/07/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 10 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 10 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 10 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 10 July 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 10 July 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 10 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 10 July 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF THOSE WHO ARE UNABLE TO MEET THE COSTS OF VETERINARY CARE BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF SUCH VETERINARY CARE, TREATMENT AND ATTENTION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window