Financial history HARVESTER REFORMATIONAL CHURCH BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1166451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.41k £20.98k £50.53k £55.98k £66.30k
Total expenditure £18.64k £9.06k £18.71k £17.51k £32.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A