HARVESTER REFORMATIONAL CHURCH BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HARVESTER REFORMATIONAL CHURCH BIRMINGHAM IS AN APOSTOLIC CHURCH OPERATING ACROSS THE UK AND THE WORLD. WE PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WITH CHURCH PLANTING AND EDUCATION, ALSO IN HELPING THOSE IN POVERTY OR OTHER AREAS OF PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL NEED
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- France
- Lebanon
- Norway
- South Africa
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 08 April 2016: Standard registration
- HRCB (Working name)
- WATER OF LIFE CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM ERIC UNSWORTH DipTh | Chair | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
WERNER PIETER LOURENS | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN KATHRYN UNSWORTH | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN CURRY | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATIE LOURENS | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.41k | £20.98k | £50.53k | £55.98k | £66.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.64k | £9.06k | £18.71k | £17.51k | £32.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT BUT ALWAYS WITHIN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 OLD OSCOTT LANE
BIRMINGHAM
B44 8TP
- Phone:
- 07486037084
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window