Financial history St Michael's Community Centre

Charity number: 506592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.62k £10.42k £11.73k £45.37k £50.57k
Total expenditure £9.54k £7.93k £20.51k £31.84k £38.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £478 £10.00k N/A £5.17k £14.90k