THE HURACAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting teachers to use football as a tool for social transformation in low-income communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Brazil
- Colombia
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Mexico
- Nepal
- Sierra Leone
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Anthony Canning | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Florence Lloyd-Hughes | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Pedersen-Smith | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martha Paola Ponciano Hernandez | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Hawker | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Fowler | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Gibbons | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hayley Barton | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Henry May | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.30k | £16.22k | £64.55k | £33.01k | £62.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.05k | £10.86k | £16.64k | £50.93k | £71.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 September 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 September 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE LIVES OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (C) FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR INTERNATIONAL CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS TO DELIVER PROJECTS USING FOOTBALL AS A TOOL FOR MOTIVATION AND LEARNING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 KINGSWOOD ROAD
LONDON
SW2 4JJ
- Phone:
- 07944183697
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window