Financial history GOAT WALK LAND TRUST

Charity number: 1162973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.74k £5.91k £3.72k £5.38k £5.03k
Total expenditure £1.98k £4.94k £1.56k £6.02k £2.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A