ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN SHAFTOE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing for persons in need in the following order of priority. 1) Residents in the Parish of Haydon over 60 years. 2) Persons resident in Haydon Parish. 3) Persons resident in Northumberland over 60 years. 4) Exceptionally, Persons resident outside of Northumberland over 60 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 08 August 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN JAMES DRYDON | Chair |
|
||||
Richard Hines | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||
Kelly Richardson | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|||
ESMOND FAULKS | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||
DORIS WARDLE | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||
LAURA ANN GILHESPY | Trustee |
|
||||
BENEDICT LOFTUS BATES | Trustee |
|
||||
EDWARD J BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||
PAULA MARIE COLLIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.89k | £35.10k | £33.22k | £35.15k | £85.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.32k | £20.38k | £28.17k | £27.36k | £57.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
02 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26TH NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS IN NEED IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: 1. PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF HAYDON WHO ARE OVER SIXTY 2. PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF HAYDON 3. PERSONS RESIDENT ELSEWHERE IN NORTHUMBERLAND WHO ARE OVER SIXTY 4. IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES PERSONS RESIDENT OUTSIDE NORTHUMBERLAND WHO ARE OVER SIXTY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HAYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Shaftoe Terrace
Haydon Bridge
HEXHAM
Northumberland
NE47 6BW
- Phone:
- 07513641342
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window