HOPE FOR THE NEEDY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to help the needy by providing shelter, food packages in times in difficult times. Our aim is to provide tools to the needy to sustain themselves where possible. We currently operate in Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 09 March 2016: CIO registration
- HOPE FOR THE NEEDY WORLDWIDE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Khalid | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sadeque Ahmed | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
TAHIR MIAH | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
FARID AHMED MIAH | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ABUL KAHIR UJJAL | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
AQIQ HASAN | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ASHRAF ALI | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SHAHIN UDDIN | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
ASHIK ALI | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
TAJ UDDIN | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
MOHAMMED ROFIQUE | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ABDUR ROHIM | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MUZIBUL ALAM | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Shohidul Islam | Trustee | 25 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.39k | £13.29k | £18.22k | £7.88k | £28.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.71k | £15.74k | £8.15k | £11.30k | £23.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN BANGLADESH BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Mannin Road
Romford
Essex
RM6 4PT
- Phone:
- 07908199035
- Email:
- info@hopefortheneedy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window