BLACKPOOL GRAND THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAIN OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE OWNERSHIP AND UPKEEP OF THE BLACKPOOL GRAND THEATRE, A GRADE 2* LISTED BUILDING. THE CHARITY RECEIVES RENTAL INCOME FROM THE LETTING OF THE THEATRE, A SHOP AND KIOSKS. THE CHARITY, PERIODICALLY, HAS APPEALS TO RAISE MONIES FOR SPECIFIC PURPOSES TO SUPPORT ITS MAIN OBJECT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackpool
Governance
- 03 October 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Lindop | Chair | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Slack | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Victor Barnett | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark David James Cunliffe | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Kathryn MacPherson | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Mark Philip James Price | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jacqueline Morris | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRADY | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Richard Baguley | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Hammond | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.91k | £188.66k | £240.73k | £179.59k | £396.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.66k | £276.81k | £282.74k | £383.18k | £310.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/07/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE THREE LOCAL AUTHORITY DISTRICTS OF BLACKPOOL, FYLDE AND WYRE IN LANCASHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE SAID LOCAL AUTHORITY DISTRICTS AFORESAID IN THE FORM OFF BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING DEFINED IN SECTION 290(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1971) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BLACKPOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRAND THEATRE TRUST LTD
33 CHURCH STREET
BLACKPOOL
FY1 1HT
- Phone:
- 01253290111
- Email:
- admin@blackpoolgrand.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window