JACARANDA UK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to give orphans in Malawi a chance at a better life. We help give them access to quality, free primary and secondary education and help stimulate social development for some of the most disadvantaged communities in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN DARROCH-THOMPSON | Chair | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anna Bianco | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Belfield Santos | Trustee | 20 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE DARROCH-THOMPSON | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW DARROCH-THOMPSON | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|||||
RICHARD HUGHES | Trustee | 06 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.35k | £9.24k | £75.13k | £52.97k | £71.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.50k | £25.36k | £37.72k | £60.75k | £68.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/08/2015 as amended on 01 May 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN MALAWI IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE TO AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF AIDS, WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY AND BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS FURTHERING SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THIS COUNTRY.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willow House
46 St Andrews Street
Mildenhall
Bury St. Edmunds
Suffolk
IP28 7HB
- Phone:
- 0203 633 0929
- Email:
- info@jacarandauk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window