ST SWITHUNS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare, for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals in Retford who have need of such facilities or for the public at large with the object of improving their conditions of life by the provision of access to non-worship space in St. Swithuns Church, Retford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK HUGH TURNER | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Veda Annette Brocklesby | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Treece White | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Portia Jane Crossley | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ANTHONY JONES | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANTHONY COATES | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 14 March 2025 | 348 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN RETFORD WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, BY THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO NON-WORSHIP SPACE IN ST SWITHUNS CHURCH, RETFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Cavendish Road
RETFORD
Nottinghamshire
DN22 7HD
- Phone:
- 01777702929
- Email:
- derekturner47@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window