EVERY-ONE (CARES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Every-One supports carers and the people they care for to have choice and to be in control of their own well-being. This is done through the development of personalised services, facilitation, project development and delivery of training and awareness raising sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £74,635 from 13 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 01 December 2015: Standard registration
- LCYCP (Working name)
- LINCOLNSHIRE CARERS AND YOUNG CARERS PARTNERSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Kenton Reed | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Clive Kendall | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Williams | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Anne Tiley | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Donald Warren | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Norman Day | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.20k | £248.18k | £217.97k | £282.32k | £313.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.02k | £214.44k | £253.20k | £225.58k | £288.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £223.04k | £66.00k | £26.00k | £70.00k | £74.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
4. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PROMOTION OF THE RELIEF OF CARERS, FORMER CARERS AND THE PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY CARE, BY: A) PROVIDING ADVICE, TRAINING, EDUCATION, INFORMATION, SERVICES AND ASSISTANCE TO CARERS, FORMER CARERS AND THE PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY CARE; B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF CARERS, FORMER CARERS AND THE PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY CARE SUCH AWARENESS TO INCLUDE THEIR NEEDS; C) FACILITATING COMMUNICATION – AMONG CARERS, FORMER CARERS AND THE PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY CARE; AND BETWEEN SUCH AFOREMENTIONED PERSONS AND EMPLOYERS, POLICY MAKERS AND SERVICE PROVIDERS; AND D) PROVIDING PREVENTATIVE SERVICES IN ORDER TO REDUCE THE REQUIREMENT FOR CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
No 5
The Stables
Wellingore Hall
Wellingore
Lincoln
Lincolns
- Phone:
- 07955612389
- Email:
- hello@every-one.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window