Governing document EVERY-ONE (CARES)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
4. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PROMOTION OF THE RELIEF OF CARERS, FORMER CARERS AND THE PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY CARE, BY: A) PROVIDING ADVICE, TRAINING, EDUCATION, INFORMATION, SERVICES AND ASSISTANCE TO CARERS, FORMER CARERS AND THE PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY CARE; B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF CARERS, FORMER CARERS AND THE PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY CARE SUCH AWARENESS TO INCLUDE THEIR NEEDS; C) FACILITATING COMMUNICATION – AMONG CARERS, FORMER CARERS AND THE PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY CARE; AND BETWEEN SUCH AFOREMENTIONED PERSONS AND EMPLOYERS, POLICY MAKERS AND SERVICE PROVIDERS; AND D) PROVIDING PREVENTATIVE SERVICES IN ORDER TO REDUCE THE REQUIREMENT FOR CARE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.