ANFAC DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to advance the education//health of public including and especialy poor and orphaned children by provision of classes and workshops. these will be provided by building education/health centres. also the provision of medical assistance including those with disability and mental illnesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ealing
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 02 February 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Abdi Greek | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Ahmed Haji | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sadiiq Osman | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 April 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR THOSE AFFECTED BY NATURAL CAUSES OR BY WAR AND CONFLICT EITHER FOREIGN OR DOMESTIC BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING AND ESPECIALLY POOR AND ORPHANED CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES, WORKSHOPS, VOCATIONAL TRAINING TO TEACH ENGLISH, COMPUTER SCIENCE AND OTHER ACADEMIC AND VOCATIONAL SUBJECTS. THESE WILL BE PROVIDED THROUGH THE CONSTRUCTION OF SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND TRAINING CENTRES. THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL ASSISTANCE INCLUDING THOSE WITH DISABILITIES AND MENTAL ILLNESSES. THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE FURTHER ASSISTANCE IN THE FORM OF FOOD PARCELS, BASIC MEDICAL SUPPLIES, CLOTHING AND EVEN FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WHERE NECESSARY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 WESTERN ROAD
Southall
UB2 5HE
- Phone:
- 07999366646
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window