YOUR ONE WISH

Charity number: 1165926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's objectives are to relieve sickness and distress of children who are underprivileged and suffering from illness and/or disabilities in such ways as the trustees think fit, in particular, but not exclusively by the granting of wishes and provision of gifts or by assisting where possible.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £26,036
Total expenditure: £76,318

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TARACHAND DASS Chair 16 April 2015
None on record
Rajan Singh Kataria Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
SATNAM SINGH PADHAM Trustee 16 April 2015
None on record
RAJ PARMAR Trustee 16 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £53.76k £77.75k £97.98k £145.55k £26.04k
Total expenditure £59.64k £108.59k £55.11k £83.62k £76.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 26 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 31 March 2024 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 31 March 2024 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 April 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 11 April 2023 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 3F
Beaver Industrial Park
Brent Road
SOUTHALL
Middlese
Phone:
07908624266