THE DENGIE D-CAF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dengie D-Caf aims to promote a good quality of life for people living with dementia on the Dengie Peninsula, as well as their carers, friends and family. It provides opportunities for people to engage in meaningful activities that meet individual social, emotional and physical needs. It also raises awareness of the issues that can affect members and helps them access support and information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 19 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Susan Bray | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Midori Joanne Abraham | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Edward Butler | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane English | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA LOUISE SOUTHCOMBE | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £819 | £1.04k | £451 | £2.66k | £9.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £894 | £749 | £454 | £1.08k | £3.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 August 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 August 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 August 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 August 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM LIVING ON THE DENGIE PENINSULA BY 1. ENABLING THEIR ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN RELATIONSHIPS OF MUTUAL SUPPORT WITHIN A COMMUNITY OF WHICH THEY SHARE OWNERSHIP, THUS REPLACING THEIR SENSE OF ISOLATION WITH A SENSE OF BELONGING 2. DEVELOPING AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA TO ENGAGE IN SOCIAL AND GROUP ACTIVITIES THAT MEET THEIR INDIVIDUAL SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS AND TO SUPPORT THEIR ENGAGEMENT IN OTHER MEANINGFUL ACTIVITIES OF THEIR CHOICE 3. RAISING AWARENESS AND PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISSUES THAT MAY AFFECT PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Garden Close
Althorne
CHELMSFORD
CM3 6BP
- Phone:
- 01621783426
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window