MERCYGIVEN LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MercyGiven work in schools in Thamesmead to re engage pupils who have fallen behind at school, also works with families going through issues in the community. It works closely with orphanages and charities in Nigeria donating clothes, toys, shoes, toiletries, food stuffs, money etc to the children living in the homes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
- Greenwich
- Kent
- Nigeria
Governance
- 07 September 2015: Standard registration
- MERCYGIVEN LTD (Working name)
- INSPIRE A CHANGE (Previous name)
- INSPITE A CHANGE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMOLARA SHOLU | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ADEDOLAPO SHOLU | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.87k | £3.95k | £3.80k | £3.87k | £3.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.16k | £3.94k | £3.79k | £4.16k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 April 2023 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 March 2022 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/08/2015 as amended on 07 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN BEXLEY AND GREENWICH BOROUGHS OF LONDON, WHO ARE NOT ENGAGING WELL IN EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MENTORING AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 OVERTON ROAD
LONDON
SE2 9SE
- Phone:
- 07956905409
- Email:
- inspireachange@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window