BEVERLEY CHERRY TREE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE AN INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY CENTRE SERVING BEVERLEY AND SURROUNDING AREA. OUR ACTIVITIES INCLUDE A FREE ADVICE SERVICE, A PRE-SCHOOL / OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB, A HOLIDAY CLUB, A YOUTH CLUB, COMMUNITY GROUPS FOR ALL AGES, A CREDIT UNION BRANCH, A HOUSING PROJECT , A COMMUNITY PANTRY AND VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £21,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 August 2015: CIO registration
- 28 February 2017: Funds received from 1028256 BEVERLEY CHERRY TREE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- THE CHERRY TREE CENTRE, (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES MILLER WHITFIELD | Chair | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALYSON CALVERT | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAUL COE | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MIDDLETON-PARSONS | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARIE RAMSDEN | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
TONY ALEXANDER HENDERSON | Trustee | 20 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA CROUCH | Trustee | 20 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES IAN SHARP | Trustee | 20 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.62k | £368.51k | £360.72k | £443.00k | £425.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.76k | £236.10k | £373.99k | £410.00k | £432.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £21.00k | N/A | £21.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.87k | £21.00k | £71.02k | £21.00k | £21.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 20 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE: 1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS PRIMARY THE TOWN OF BEVERLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (THEREIN CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. 3. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS, AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY DETERMINE. 4. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 Cherry Tree Lane
Beverley
HU17 0AY
- Phone:
- 01482871993
- Email:
- manager@ctca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window