GRASSROOTS PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grassroots is an ecumenical Christian programme of community engagement. In dialogue with the Churches and other faith communities, GRASSROOTS strives to uncover Christ's presence in a sharp edge of engagement with contemporary issues of community relations, peace and reconciliation in Luton's diverse context.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Luton
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DAVID M LAWSON | Chair | 06 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Purfield | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Robert Roe | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Bird | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev PHILIP JOHN HORNER | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH NANCY MARGARET TETLOW | Trustee | 12 January 2007 |
|
|||||
SHEILA JOYCE MARSDEN | Trustee | 06 April 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.79k | £190.25k | £84.34k | £114.58k | £134.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.05k | £161.50k | £103.46k | £116.42k | £143.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN GLOBAL ISSUES TO ENABLE GREATER AWARENESS OF FACTORS THAT WILL CONTRIBUTE TO THE RELIEF OF NEEDY VICTIMS OF BREECHES OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN SUCH WAYS AS IS CHARITABLE IN LAW. 2) TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING AMONG CHRISTIANS AND THOSE OF OTHER FAITHS. 3) TO ENGAGE IN ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES THAT WILL FURTHER THE ABOVE OBJECTS, PROVIDED THAT SUCH ACTIVITIES ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN LAW
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 High Town Road
Luton
Bedfordshire
LU2 0BW
- Phone:
- 01582416946
- Email:
- jgrassroots@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window