NORTH EASTERN RAILWAY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the ClO is to advance the education of the public in the history of all the railways that have operated in the North East of England, particularly the North Eastern Railway its constituents and successors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of York
- Darlington
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Sunderland
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 November 2015: CIO registration
- NERA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Mackay | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sykes | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAM MITCHELL | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward John Orwin | Trustee | 12 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
John McCree Scott MBE JP | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Tully | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Richardson | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Richardson | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Williamson | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David John Williamson | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.15k | £42.26k | £28.37k | £37.46k | £41.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.57k | £24.91k | £27.02k | £33.79k | £32.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF ALL THE RAILWAYS THAT HAVE OPERATED IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND, PARTICULARLY THE NORTH EASTERN RAILWAY ITS CONSTITUENTS AND SUCCESSORS. THE CIO WILL ACHIEVE THIS OBJECT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) COLLECTING AND PRESERVING HISTORICAL RECORDS, AND MAKING THEM AVAILABLE TO MEMBERS AND OTHER INTERESTED INDIVIDUALS. B) REGULARLY PUBLISHING A JOURNAL CONTAINING HISTORICALLY ACCURATE INFORMATION AND ANALYSIS. C) ARRANGING A PROGRAMME OF MEETINGS/EXHIBITIONS, OPEN TO MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC, TO DISSEMINATE ACCURATE INFORMATION. D) ENCOURAGING THE CONSTRUCTION OF ACCURATE MODELS OF THE STATED RAILWAYS' ROLLING STOCK, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, AND OPERATIONS. E) ENCOURAGING THE WRITING OF APPROPRIATE BOOKS AND THEIR PUBLICATION, WHICH EDUCATE THE PUBLIC. F) WORKING WITH PUBLIC AND PRIVATE BODIES SUCH AS COMMUNITY RAIL PARTNERSHIPS AND TRAIN OPERATING COMPANIES TO PRODUCE SUCH GUIDE BOOKS AND STATION INFORMATION PANELS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 McNay Street
Darlington
DL3 6SW
- Phone:
- 07508223976
- Email:
- secretary@ner.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window