ALFORD FOCAL POINT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To operate in conjunction with statutory and local authorities voluntary and other organisations without distinction of sex, sexual orientation race or political or other opinions :- A lending library for the benefit of the inhabitants of Alford and the surrounding area. A community resource centre for all who wish to use it
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £5,167 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 July 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH GRAHAM RAMM | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Lucy Iaquaniello | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD QUANTRELL | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||
VICTORIA LOUISE HYNES | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ANDREW PATRICK TAYLOR | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.62k | £39.34k | £37.61k | £5.95k | £5.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.17k | £10.34k | £8.96k | £4.31k | £3.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.17k | £33.72k | £37.37k | £5.17k | £5.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 13 December 2023 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF ALFORD LINCOLNSHIRE, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE STATUTORY AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO PROMOTE IN A COMMON EFFORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A LENDING LIBRARY AND COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A FACILITY FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF ITS OBJECTS. (3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suncrest
Alford Road
Bilsby
ALFORD
Lincolnshire
LN13 9PY
- Phone:
- 01507464963
- Email:
- alfordfocalpoint@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window