RAANS GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities and instruction for gymnastics and related activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 01 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT DAVID HIRST | Chair | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MORRIS | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PAUL HENRY BURKINYOUNG | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.23k | £127.22k | £34.05k | £113.75k | £165.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.95k | £147.50k | £54.86k | £127.44k | £145.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.56k | £561 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 March 2025 | 247 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 March 2025 | 247 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 February 2025 | 608 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 February 2025 | 608 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND INSTRUCTION FOR GYMNASTICS AND RELATED ACTIVITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 POLES HILL
CHESHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP5 2QP
- Phone:
- 01494 773849
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window