LONDON CHAMBER MUSIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of chamber music for the benefit of the public at affordable prices by the presentation of public concerts and recitals by professional musicians together with public lectures and social events and to encourage young audiences and to promote contemporary chamber music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 November 2015: Standard registration
- 26 January 2017: Funds received from 1075787 THE LONDON CHAMBER MUSIC SOCIETY
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEON LEVY | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria-Alexandra Paceana | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virag Maria Muzslai | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Federico Dabezies | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katerina Jelinkova | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA KREMER | Trustee | 27 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
WALTER RUDELOFF | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|||||
VIVIEN LEVY | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARTHA SUFIAN | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CROPLEY RUDELOFF | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER FRIBBINS | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.45k | £7.40k | £23.61k | £23.36k | £16.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.44k | £7.69k | £29.18k | £21.53k | £19.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JUN 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CHAMBER MUSIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT AFFORDABLE PRICES BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS BY PROFESSIONAL MUSICIANS TOGETHER WITH PUBLIC LECTURES AND SOCIAL EVENTS AND TO ENCOURAGE YOUNG AUDIENCES AND TO PROMOTE CONTEMPORARY CHAMBER MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 SUSSEX WAY
LONDON
N7 6RS
- Phone:
- 02083493103
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window