DRYBURN THEATRICAL WORKSHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dryburn Theatrical Workshop is an enthusiastic amateur theatre group, based in Chester-le-Street, County Durham, which has been performing for over 45 years. We perform a pantomime in January, a musical in June and a play in September. We have over 70 members, aged 11 and upwards. As a group, we bring together an eclectic mix of talented local people, keen to learn and entertain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 22 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS A L MORRIS | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR B PENNICK | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS M A COULSON | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS K A SCOTT | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS S HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 11 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.48k | £5.98k | £26.03k | £42.43k | £44.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.53k | £5.11k | £28.87k | £35.74k | £39.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE CHESTER-LE-STREET AREA IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF AMATEUR THEATRE THROUGH THE PERFORMANCE OF MUSICALS, PANTOMIMES, CONCERTS AND PLAYS AND SUCH OTHER PRODUCTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 SINCLAIR DRIVE
CHESTER LE STREET
DH3 4BJ
- Phone:
- 01913888045
- Email:
- ANNETTE.MORRIS3@ICLOUD.COM
- Website:
-
dryburntheatricalworkshop.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window