KEELE WORLD AFFAIRS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity invites speakers of national and international standing to lecture on international politics, economics, and other global issues, aiming to encourage lifelong learning and improve public understanding. Attendance is restricted to course subscribers. Details, and archived proceedings of most lectures, are on the website kwaku.org.uk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 18 November 2015: CIO registration
- WORLD AFFAIRS SOCIETY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES WILLIAM BOYNTON MA | Chair | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Wise KC | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lindsay Lambert | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Caryn Ellsmore | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Manning Arkle FICA | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sinead Grant Escott | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Garnett | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gary John Provis | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John David Sherwood | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Cartwright | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen Parr | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|||||
DONALD MUIR | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN GILBERT BERRY JP | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.54k | £11.37k | £3.89k | £14.98k | £15.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.12k | £10.47k | £5.14k | £14.30k | £15.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH LECTURES AND OTHER FORMS OF LEARNING IN THE FIELDS OF POLITICS, ECONOMICS AND GLOBAL ISSUES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) CREATING AN ENVIRONMENT THAT ENCOURAGES LIFELONG LEARNING AT COURSES ORGANISED BY THE CIO; AND (II) SHARING THE KNOWLEDGE GAINED AT ITS COURSES WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wits End
School Lane
Astbury
Congleton
CW12 4RG
- Phone:
- 01260290539
- Email:
- chairman@kwaku.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window