Financial history BETHNAL GREEN WEIGHTLIFTING CLUB

Charity number: 1163424
Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £77.06k £77.06k £22.50k £22.62k £46.14k
Total expenditure £56.07k £56.07k £49.81k £29.73k £42.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A