Accounts and annual returns ICE HOCKEY INSPIRED LTD

Charity Number: 1165470
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 01 July 2024 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 01 July 2024 123 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 24 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 24 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 03 May 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 03 May 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 26 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 26 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window