IPSOS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has been established to: 1. Advance the education of young persons of all faiths in such ways as the Trustees think fit, with particular regard to those who are economically or socially disadvantaged, whether in the UK or elsewhere in the world; and/or 2. Pursue such other charitable purposes consistent with the above as the Trustees in their absolute discretion shall determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Cambodia
- Chad
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Dominican Republic
- Germany
- Haiti
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Italy
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Malaysia
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Romania
- Russia
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Yemen
- Zambia
Governance
- 08 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Moore | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Walker | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Atchison | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GOSSCHALK | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.25k | £119.23k | £381.57k | £258.90k | £345.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £370.54k | £116.02k | £379.08k | £216.82k | £386.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 May 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 May 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 APR 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS OF ALL FAITHS OR NONE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THOSE WHO ARE ECONOMICALLY OR SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED, WHETHER IN THE UK OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD; AND/OR 2. TO PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF CLAUSE 1, THE CHARITY SHALL SUPPORT: 1. THE EDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENT, ACADEMIC SUPPORT, SUPPLEMENTARY TUITION OR OUTREACH PROGRAMMES FOR THOSE IN NEED; AND/OR 2. THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE; AND/OR 3. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS RELATING TO SELF HELP, EMPOWERMENT, CAPACITY BUILDING, SKILLS DEVELOPMENT AND/OR ANTI-POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cansdales
St. Marys Court
The Broadway
AMERSHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP7 0UT
- Phone:
- 02030595038
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window