MAKE A DIFFERENCE ENTERTAINMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FILM, TV & VIDEO PRODUCTION, FREE TRAINING & WORKSHOPS, OUTCOME 2: INCREASED CAREER READINESS FOR BAME & OR LGBTQ PEOPLE, OUTCOME 1: DECREASED PREJUDICE & DISCRIMINATION ABOUT BAME & OR LGBTQ PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 March 2016: CIO registration
- 15 May 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 15 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1197140 C-CHANGE WEST LONDON
- MADE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.56k | £61.64k | £49.14k | £25.17k | £36.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.85k | £67.39k | £52.42k | £28.35k | £37.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £13.28k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MEDIA SKILLS AND FILM-MAKING. 3. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window