LITTLE LAURA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Renovation of a special needs school farm Building of a special needs school sensory garden Providing a chicken coop to support curriculum Providing equipment for Riding for Disabled classes Library books E-reader pens Fundraising events such as curry night, quiz night and christmas party.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 03 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA THOMAS | Chair | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
KIM NOBLE | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA THOMAS | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.16k | £5.67k | £505 | £1.02k | £2.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £8.44k | £2.53k | £203 | £548 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/06/2015
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 2. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 21 THROUGHOUT THE WORLD SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION BY PROVIDING GRANTS OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 HUNTERS CLOSE
GREAT HAYWOOD
STAFFORD
ST18 0GF
- Phone:
- 01889881375
- Email:
- littlelauratink@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window