MARGAM CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playing of cricket for all age groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £5,100 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 19 April 2016: Standard registration
- MCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Arthur William Shuck | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA JANE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BOND | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.71k | £12.15k | £6.70k | £7.00k | £10.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.33k | £5.76k | £10.45k | £11.08k | £6.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £750 | N/A | N/A | £5.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED ON 04 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: FOR THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT IF THE INHABITANTS OF PORT TALBOT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 EDITH MILLS CLOSE
NEATH
SA11 2JL
- Phone:
- 07919170603
- Email:
- johnwellington@rlisales.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window