ST JOHN'S HALL MEADOWFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a community building
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,045 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 22 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CARL PETERS | Chair | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ben Hopson | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Beck | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Scarr | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY BAXTER | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.94k | £23.89k | £31.86k | £46.71k | £25.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.01k | £40.52k | £29.04k | £45.80k | £24.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.80k | £13.90k | £2.47k | £5.84k | £3.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LANGLEY MOOR, MEADOWFIELD AND BRANDON (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE" AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE CENTRE, WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY, IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Hall
John Street South
Meadowfield
DURHAM
DH7 8RP
- Phone:
- 07846542035
- Email:
- lesleypb@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window