DISABILITY CAN DO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disability Can Do works with, and supports disabled adults and carers to break down the barriers, big and small, that restrict their life choices and opportunities. We place their needs at the centre of our services and empower people by providing information, advice and support that enables them to make informed decisions and choices in their lives and improves their overall well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 19 August 2015: CIO registration
- 16 June 2017: Funds received from 1126797 DISABILITY CAN DO ORGANISATION
- DCD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER BEVAN | Chair | 24 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN AMBERRY | Trustee | 24 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PRICE | Trustee | 24 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TUDOR DAVIES | Trustee | 24 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Maurice Alexander McCartney | Trustee | 24 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN CURTIS | Trustee | 24 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.26k | £215.68k | £109.13k | £112.90k | £104.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.10k | £182.02k | £160.84k | £136.88k | £107.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.00k | £6.84k | N/A | £200 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2023 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2023 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 May 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY IMPROVING THE AVAILABILITY OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND COMMUNITY ADVOCACY SERVICES FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DISABLED PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 High Street
Fleur De Lis
BLACKWOOD
Gwent
NP12 3UB
- Phone:
- 01495233555
- Email:
- admin@disabilitycando.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window