HACKNEY PLAYBUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HACKNEY PLAYBUS DELIVERS MOBILE PLAY AND OUTREACH SERVICES IN ORDER TO MAKE PLAY AND LEARNING ACCESSIBLE TO CHILDREN 0-4 YEARS, TO SUPPORT PARENTING CONFIDENCE, TO CONNECT FAMILIES TO SUPPORT SERVICES, TO COMBAT ISOLATION AND BUILD STRONGER COMMUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £47,254 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 October 2015: CIO registration
- 20 July 2016: Funds received from 1067000 HACKNEY PLAYBUS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Davey | Chair | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mia Johnson Hall | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
YOLANDA BROWNE | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL PULLEN | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANISIOBI | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eva Brooks | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LE BON | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Wooldridge | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
STUART HUNT | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNABELLE BURNS | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNTOINETTE BRAMBLE | Trustee | 09 November 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.97k | £232.64k | £187.45k | £198.41k | £324.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.80k | £183.73k | £208.08k | £230.63k | £272.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £47.57k | £33.63k | £26.71k | £25.00k | £47.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR GROUP PLAY IN WHICH THE CHILDREN'S PARENTS/CARERS CAN PARTICIPATE WHERE APPROPRIATE; (2) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY OR SURROUNDING BOROUGHS SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80A Eastway
LONDON
E9 5JH
- Phone:
- 07973183607
- Email:
- info@hackneyplaybus.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window