Financial history SSP FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1163717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £160.41k £61.88k £91.72k £358.66k £408.91k
Total expenditure £390.05k £101.07k £369.41k £222.31k £428.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A