SAFETYNET CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's object is To advance education for the general public in internet safety and the provision of safe, secure and reliable broadband internet connections which can be accessed by the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bury
- Salford City
Governance
- 08 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eliyahu David Benouaich | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yitzchok Reuven Rubin Rabbi | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
CRAIG CHAIM YITZCHOK SCHERER | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.43k | £46.54k | £44.95k | £57.40k | £57.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.76k | £45.83k | £54.40k | £58.23k | £62.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN INTERNET SAFETY AND THE PROVISION OF SAFE, SECURE AND RELIABLE BROADBAND INTERNET CONNECTIONS WHICH CAN BE ACCESSED BY THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
158 Cromwell Road
SALFORD
M6 6DE
- Phone:
- 01617929461
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window