Financial history LEEDS NORTH AND WEST FOODBANK

Charity number: 1162983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £415.29k £602.96k £382.19k £604.80k £601.79k
Total expenditure £300.71k £344.81k £348.64k £576.29k £664.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £347.54k N/A £217.24k £387.20k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £387.56k £214.03k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £255.42k N/A £0 £560
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £344.81k N/A £571.57k £664.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £4.72k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £8.17k £3.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0