Trustees CRUSADER COMMUNITY BOATING

Charity number: 1163121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN NEAL Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Michael John Watts Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
David Garratt Trustee 20 January 2024
None on record
Paul Hickerson Trustee 04 September 2023
None on record
Geoffrey Hugh Fellows Trustee 28 January 2023
BRODIE-LODGE PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
Jill Baker Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Julie Colman Trustee 12 December 2022
None on record