AL-ITQAAN ONLINE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1164153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is Provide the following courses Online: 1. Memorization of the Al-Quran. This will be provided free of charge. 2. Recitation of the Al-Quran with Tajweed rules. This will be provided at subsidised rate. 3. Arabic language courses. This will be provided at rate with marginal profit. This profit along with donations will be used to fund the two above courses.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,652
Total expenditure: £3,778

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YUSUF MAHADIK Chair 01 October 2015
None on record
Samiya Mahadik Trustee 04 January 2021
None on record
Dr SAMAR RAZAQ Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
INTIKHAB MAHADIK Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.79k £61.29k £81.17k £33.06k £1.65k
Total expenditure £29.75k £49.47k £77.18k £31.31k £3.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Walnut Close
Oadby
LEICESTER
LE2 5QJ
Phone:
07739999042
Email:
No information available