PARKSTONE CHRISTADELPHIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance Bible based Christian teaching for members of the public and the Christadelphian Community centred around Poole and Bournemouth. We hold meetings which are open to the public usually at our Hall in Douglas Road Parkstone. We collect for many charities, both as part of the Christadelphian ecosystem and for local and national charities. We strive to serve our members and the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Poole
Governance
- 14 September 2015: Standard registration
- THE PARKSTONE (POOLE) CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victor Daniel Perfitt | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Longland | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ERIC ROBIN LOWE | Trustee | 23 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.13k | £30.98k | £28.22k | £27.69k | £31.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.61k | £35.09k | £26.56k | £33.74k | £36.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 AUG 2015 as amended on 09 Mar 2020 as amended on 06 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE BIBLE BASED CHRISTIAN FAITH TO THE GLORY OF GOD AND THE HONOUR OF JESUS CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTADELPHIAN BIRMINGHAM AMENDED STATEMENT OF FAITH, A COPY OF WHICH IS ANNEXED TO THIS CONSTITUTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHRISTADELPHIAN COMMUNITY AND OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY IN AND AROUND POOLE AND BOURNEMOUTH THROUGH: HOLDING MEETINGS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, FOR WORSHIP, PRAYER, BREAKING OF BREAD BY CHRISTADELPHIANS AND BIBLE TEACHING; PREACHING TO THE PUBLIC THROUGH PERSONAL ENGAGEMENT, BY INVITATION TO SPECIAL MEETINGS, SEMINARS AND SEASONAL EVENTS AND OTHER MEANS; ENGAGING WITH THE LOCAL PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUNDAY SCHOOL/AND OR YOUTH CLUB(S) AND/OR OTHER OCCASIONAL ACTIVITIES; ENGAGING WITH THE WIDER CHRISTADELPHIAN COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER PUBLIC THROUGH PERIODIC COLLECTIONS FOR CHARITABLE NEEDS, INCLUDING COLLECTIONS FOR DISASTER RELIEF; AND SERVING, TO THE EXTENT FEASIBLE, THE PASTORAL AND OTHER WELFARE NEEDS OF CHURCH MEMBERS AND OTHERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 Wimborne Road West
WIMBORNE
Dorset
BH21 2DH
- Phone:
- 01202540590
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window