THE GORING AND STREATLEY CONCERT BAND

Charity Number: 1162920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rehearsal and Performance of Wind Band Music

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £9,977
Total expenditure: £10,153

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GORING AND STREATLEY CONCERT BAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara Elizabeth Benbow Chair 30 July 2015
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF ORGANISTS
Received: On time
THE SCHOOL OF ST HELEN AND ST KATHARINE TRUST
Received: On time
Alison Louise Esplin Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Kathryn Louise Elizabeth Goodey Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Ruth Jolly Trustee 17 May 2022
THE GORING AND STREATLEY YOUNG MUSICIANS TRUST
Recently registered
David John Slarks Trustee 11 February 2020
None on record
Nick Cooper Trustee 16 November 2015
None on record
JAN BUHAGIAR Trustee 30 July 2015
None on record
BERYL MARGUERITE JAMES Trustee 30 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £7.52k £7.52k £4.90k £9.13k £9.98k
Total expenditure £4.48k £4.48k £6.77k £8.86k £10.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 08 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 22 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tryfan, 31 Elvendon Road
GORING
READING
SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE
RG8 0DP
Phone:
07983976475