KESWICK MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mountain Rescue service in the Keswick area of the Lake District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- KESWICK MRT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Sean Bazire | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hume | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES SIMON LAMB | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER JEREMY LITTLE | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS HIGGINS | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHARD HUNSTON | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.04k | £213.47k | £303.77k | £711.45k | £319.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.94k | £139.78k | £157.50k | £220.99k | £263.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £689.37k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £399.94k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £214.75k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.24k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £920 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
3. OBJECT THE OBJECT OF THE TEAM IS TO BE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND THE DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM, AMONG PERSONS AND ANIMALS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENT OR NATURAL HAZARDS ANYWHERE AND PARTICULARLY ON THE MOUNTAINS OF CUMBRIA IN THE VICINITY OF KESWICK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KESWICK MOUNTAIN RESCUE
LAKE ROAD
KESWICK
CA12 5DJ
- Phone:
- 01768774400
- Email:
- secretary@keswickmrt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window