BUCKET LIST WISHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We grant wishes for terminally ill adults in Berkshire. Please go to our website www.bucketlistwishes.org.uk to read all about our special Charity. You can read why we started in 2013, what wishes we've granted and how to apply for a wish. We run the charity solely with volunteers so that means we can trace your donations and the funds you raise to who's wish they help us grant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GINI HACKETT | Chair | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATIE WHELPDALE | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA LITTLE BSC HONS | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.70k | £9.17k | £20.07k | £20.60k | £23.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.20k | £18.94k | £16.26k | £23.82k | £25.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED ON 20/12/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO ADULTS SUFFERING FROM A TERMINAL ILLNESS IN THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND BY THE GRANTING OF A FEASIBLE WISH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Normoor Road
Burghfield Common
READING
RG7 3QG
- Phone:
- 07951400055
- Email:
- team@bucketlistwishes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window