SALTFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity runs a village hall and a number of its associated activities, as well as letting out its premises to other interest groups. It facilitates community participation by also running a village festival every other year, and has some sectional organisations, panto, choir, drama, short mat bowls, and a small musical production group, as well as computer classes and a community cinema.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £1,493 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 31 July 2015: CIO registration
- SCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Evans | Chair | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Joyce Ashworth | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Anne Lilian Evans | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Coles | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mary Easterford | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Roland Essex | Trustee | 30 November 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.98k | £125.25k | £175.97k | £204.08k | £183.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.72k | £102.07k | £183.36k | £173.45k | £160.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.11k | £31.83k | £29.95k | N/A | £1.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 31 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
A) TO BRING TOGETHER THE SALTFORD COMMUNITY AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY WELFARE. B) TO PROMOTE RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SUCH THAT IT HAS A POSITIVE INFLUENCE ON THE COMMUNITY. C) HAVING ESTABLISHED A COMMUNITY CENTRE, TO MAINTAIN, MANAGE AND IMPROVE IT IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. THIS MAY AT TIMES REQUIRE THAT THE ASSOCIATION CO-OPERATES WITH OTHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, PERSONS OR BODIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saltford Hall
Chelwood Road
Saltford
BRISTOL
BS31 3BU
- Phone:
- 01225873296
- Email:
- secretary@saltfordhall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window