EDWARDS LANE ESTATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Over 50?s Dance Group Job Club Citizens Advice Taekwondo Summer club Youth clubs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Total income includes £2,214 from government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 04 August 2015: CIO registration
- 09 December 2016: Funds received from 517291 EDWARDS LANE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Peacock | Chair | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Samuels | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Hutchinson | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Hall | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
EULYN VALARIE JACKIE BROWN-WATT | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1408 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1408 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1773 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1773 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 04 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.THE AREA OF BENEFIT ("AREA OF BENEFIT") SHALL BE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edwards Lane Community Centre
Alderton Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 6DX
- Phone:
- 01159209511
- Email:
- elcc@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
edwardslaneestatecommunitycentre.webs.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window