EMMANUEL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP - ILFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the local area with the opportunity to worship and to present the Christian faith to the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- City Of London
- Essex
- India
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 07 October 2016: CIO registration
- ECF - ILFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KANAGARATNAM JOSEPH | Chair | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
NADARAJAH KANDIAH | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANESLYN ANTON | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAHENDRARAJAH REGINALD IREANUS ARULAPPAN | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.13k | £72.70k | £70.81k | £82.52k | £86.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.12k | £54.04k | £77.31k | £79.20k | £62.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.72k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2023 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2023 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2022 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2022 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 4.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ILFORD, ESSEX AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 4.2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN SRI LANKA AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND 4.3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN SRI LANKA AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
513
Loughborough House
2 Honour Gardens
Dagenham
- Phone:
- 07903436250
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window