DASH OF SILVER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote good health and raising awareness of Male Cancers for the Public benefit. Provide support and advice to those Males affected by Cancer, either through having a personal experience through Cancer or from looking after a loved one with Cancer for the Public benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 19 August 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL SILVER | Chair | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alexa Jay Spire | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACOB QUELCH | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JASON BROCKMAN | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.40k | £6.04k | £16.80k | £5.29k | £3.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.09k | £6.33k | £19.47k | £7.43k | £3.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED ON 10/08/2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RAISING AWARENESS OF MALE CANCERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SO THAT PEOPLE ARE MORE AWARE AND INFORMED OF THE IMPORTANCE OF HEALTHY LIFESTYLE CHOICES AND BY PROMOTING THE CORE MESSAGE OF 'KNOW YOUR BODY' AS ADVOCATED BY THOSE WORKING IN CANCER RESEARCH TREATMENT AND CURE. (B) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ADVANCING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL CARE, RESEARCH (WHERE THE USEFUL RESULTS ARE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT) AND TREATMENT OF THOSE SUFFERING WITH MALE CANCERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 Estuary Way
Barne Barton
Plymouth
PL5 1FE
- Phone:
- 07769158300
- Email:
- Dan@dashofsilver.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window