NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE HANDICAPPED CHILDREN'S BOAT COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 08 September 1977: Standard registration
- 21 February 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 February 2008: Funds transferred to 1089860 THE BEATRICE CHARITY
- BEATRICE (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED 9 AUGUST 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF HANDICAPPED AND SOCIALLY DEPRIVED CHILDRED LIVING IN NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE BY PROVIDING AND OPERATING A SPECIALLY DESIGNED BOAT TO TAKE THE CHILDREN ON HOLIDAYS AND OUTINGS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window