SPOTLIGHT YOPD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A UK-based charity with a global reach, raising awareness of Young Onset Parkinson's Disease and providing support to those living with the condition - using resources both online and offline.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 January 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Elaine Harding | Chair | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Leighton Kay | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Atul Sharda | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samantha Cole | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Rose Hermione Knighton | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shazia Dar | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Eagles | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Joy Lee | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Michael Standen | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Webb | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Smith | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.16k | £1.81k | £3.95k | £3.52k | £7.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49k | £1.81k | £3.02k | £1.76k | £3.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE THOSE SUFFERING FROM YOUNG ONSET PARKINSON’S DISEASE (YOPD) AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT BOTH FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING SCIENTIFIC EDUCATION) AND RAISE AWARENESS IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO YOUNG ONSET PARKINSON'S DISEASE (YOPD)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bridgehouse Company Secretaries Ltd
181 Queen Victoria Street
LONDON
EC4V 4EG
- Phone:
- 07954 136119
- Email:
- contact@spotlightyopd.org
- Website:
-
spotlightYOPD.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window